MRS J M PALMER-MOREWOOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity to benefit 14 named beneficairies or such other charitable bodies and organisations as the trustees shall nominate during the trust period:- Cancer Research UK, RNIB, Institute of Cancer, NSPCA., NSPCC, RSPCA, Guide Dogs for the Blind, Arthritis Care, RNLI, Battersea Dogs Home, British Red Cross, Help the Aged, National Trust and RAF Benevolent Fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 February 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 June 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/02/2020 | 01/02/2021 | 01/02/2022 | 01/02/2023 | 01/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.11k | £3.92k | £4.35k | £4.49k | £6.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.76k | £3.89k | £2.59k | £14.14k | £13.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2020 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 FEB 1980
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THEREOF IN TRUST FOR ALL OR SUCH ONE OR MORE EXCLUSIVELY OF: I) THE BENEFICIARIES (SEE SCHEDULE FOR LIST OF CHARITIES); AND II) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOMINATE BY ANY WRITTEN RESOLUTION FROM TIME TO TIME DURING THE TRUST PERIOD AT SUCH TIME OR RESPECTIVE TIMES IF MORE THAN ONE IN SUCH SHARES AND WITH SUCH TRUSTS FOR THEIR RESPECTIVE BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window