CROSS SECTOR SAFETY AND SECURITY COMMUNICATIONS

Charity number: 1153764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity operates a partnership-based framework to communicate with businesses across England & Wales, helping them address safety, security, resilience and emergency issues.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £100,256
Total expenditure: £90,047

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 September 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CSSC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir David Hugh Wootton Chair 01 April 2015
MORDEN COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE CITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE JESUS COLLEGE BOAT CLUB TRUST
Received: On time
CHARLES DICKENS CENTRE (GAD'S HILL) LIMITED
Received: On time
THE WOOLMEN'S COMPANY CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Received: On time
BOWYERS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LORD MAYOR'S 800TH ANNIVERSARY AWARDS TRUST
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF WOOLMEN SUSTAINABILITY START-UP & INNOVATION FUND LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ROCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL BENEVOLENT AND EDUCATIONAL FUND FOR WATERMEN AND LIGHTERMEN
Received: On time
THE COMPANY OF WATERMEN AND LIGHTERMEN OF THE RIVER THAMES POORS FUND
Received: On time
Gary Ritchie Trustee 14 January 2020
CRANSTOUN
Received: On time
Richard Woolford Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Kevin Blythe Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Emily Walker Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Paul Crowther Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
David Ward Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Richard Michael Barnes Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Mark Duffy Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Peter Lavery Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Ian Dyson QPM, DL Trustee 01 April 2017
FIRST AID NURSING YEOMANRY (PRINCESS ROYAL'S VOLUNTEER CORPS) (FANY(PRVC))
Received: On time
CONSORTIUM FOR THE PREVENTION OF SUICIDE
Received: On time
Robert Charles Wilson Trustee 01 April 2017
CITY OF LONDON CRIME PREVENTION ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SUSAN TERPILOWSKI Trustee 01 April 2017
SOUTH WEST ESSEX & SETTLEMENT REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Received: On time
Philip Collins Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
DON RANDALL Trustee 18 June 2013
CITY OF LONDON CRIME PREVENTION ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
JANET WILLIAMS QPM Trustee 18 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £55.14k £31.40k £65.36k £41.04k £100.26k
Total expenditure £41.81k £37.30k £38.45k £39.58k £90.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Azets
Regis House
45 King William Street
LONDON
EC4R 9AN
Phone:
07500864849