THE BERKELEY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Berkeley Foundation works in partnership to help young people in the areas where Berkeley Group works to overcome barriers, improve their lives and build a fairer society, with the vision of creating a society in which every young person can thrive. The Foundation focuses on supporting young people across four themes: Homelessness, Employment, Skills and Health & Wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£3,144,445
Donations and legacies | £3.01m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £134.89k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,136,481
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.14m | |
Other | £10 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.14m | |
Retained for future use | £7.96k |
People

5 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 June 2013: Standard registration
- THE BERKELEY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE BERKELEY FOUNDATION 2013 (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Piers Martin Clanford | Chair | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Adekunle | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Jane Dowsett | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CHARLES GRENVILLE PERRINS | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
WENDY JOAN PRITCHARD | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.75m | £2.59m | £2.63m | £3.36m | £3.14m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.41m | £2.48m | £2.60m | £3.46m | £3.14m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.73m | £2.58m | £2.62m | £3.30m | £3.01m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £19.50k | £11.81k | £4.63k | £54.34k | £134.89k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.41m | £2.48m | £2.60m | £3.46m | £3.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.45k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.94m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £305 | £19 | £214 | £169 | £10 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £4.71m | £4.49m | £4.20m | £4.21m | £4.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.01m | £2.67m | £2.35m | £2.46m | £2.47m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/07/2013 as amended on 06 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF: EDUCATION; AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN LIFE THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITY AND CAPABILITY TO ENABLE THEIR PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY; THE PROMOTION OF URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG YOUNG AND/OR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE; THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; AND THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, AND IN PARTICULAR, THOSE WHO, BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES; THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PREVENTION, CURE, SUPPORT OF SUFFERERS OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF ALL FORMS OF DISEASE; THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND/OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE SUPPORT OF RESEARCH INTO, AND PROMOTION OF, THE USE OF RENEWABLE ENERGY RESOURCES AND ENVIRONMENTALLY SUSTAINABLE MATERIALS; THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, PARTICULARLY WITH REGARD TO RESIDENTIAL DEVELOPMENT, BY THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED WHETHER BECAUSE OF POVERTY, YOUTH, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC AND WHICH ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS STATED ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES DIRECTORS SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BERKELEY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
BERKELEY HOUSE
19 PORTSMOUTH ROAD
COBHAM
KT11 1JG
- Phone:
- 01932584551
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window