THE BLOSSOM CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blossom is a charitable incorporated organisation (CIO) aimed at developing, educating and assisting with the employability of individuals of the socially and economically disadvantaged communities of Norfolk and Suffolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
89 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 20 September 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIDGET MCINTYRE | Chair | 07 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Louis Sutherland | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Angela Ralph | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela Susan Doolin | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY MARJORIE HUMPHREY | Trustee | 07 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.39k | £119.41k | £192.53k | £166.06k | £162.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.37k | £99.17k | £130.93k | £181.69k | £172.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.33k | £20.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 November 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Sep 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN SUCH WAYS THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES TO: DEVELOP, EDUCATE AND ASSIST WITH THE EMPLOYABILITY OF INDIVIDUALS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF EAST ANGLIA, WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE AND SUPPORT. IN SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE CHARITABLE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, BY: THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF INDIVIDUALS WITH A VIEW OF DEVELOPING SKILLS TO ENHANCE THE EMPLOYABILITY OF INDIVIDUALS; WHILST ALSO DEVELOPING INTER-PERSONAL SKILLS AND DEALING WITH INDIVIDUALS WHO MAY BE SUFFERING FROM A WIDE SPECTRUM OF DIFFICULTIES SUCH AS: LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, A LACK OF MEANS AND / OR INDIVIDUAL HARDSHIP; BY TRAINING, COACHING AND COUNSELLING INDIVIDUALS SO THEY ARE BETTER EQUIPPED TO INTERACT OTHERS, FIND EMPLOYMENT, DEAL WITH HARDSHIP AND TO INTERACT WITH SOCIETY AS A WHOLE AND TO BENEFIT THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Castle Street
EYE
IP23 7AN
- Phone:
- 01379678483
- Email:
- info@theblossomcharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window