BOTANICAL SOCIETY OF BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE BOTANICAL SOCIETY OF BRITAIN AND IRELAND IS THE SUCCESSOR BODY OF THE BOTANICAL SOCIETY OF THE BRITISH ISLES (CHARITY NO 212560) AND COMMENCED ACTIVITIES ON 1 NOVEMBER 2013. ITS PURPOSE IS TO SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE AMATEUR AND PROFESSIONAL BOTANISTS TO PARTICIPATE IN RESEARCH INTO THE TAXONOMY, ECOLOGY, BIOGEOGRAPHY AND CONSERVATION OF THE BRITISH AND IRISH FLORA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£818,239
Donations and legacies | £187.44k | |
Charitable activities | £322.43k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £22.50k | |
Other | £285.87k |
Total expenditure:
£697,061
Raising funds | £137.83k | |
Charitable activities | £559.23k | |
Other | £0 |
£53,265 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £130,955 from 5 government contract(s) and £70,909 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £137.83k | |
Charitable expenditure | £559.23k | |
Retained for future use | £121.18k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £137.83k | |
Charitable expenditure | £559.23k | |
Retained for future use | £174.44k |
People

13 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 July 2013: Standard registration
- 15 December 2014: Funds received from 212560 BOTANICAL SOCIETY OF THE BRITISH ISLES
- BSBI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Oliver Edwards | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Dr ANDREW JOHN LACK | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Kathleen Nicola Jayne Tainton | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard John Allanach | Trustee | 06 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
TREVOR DINES | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Maria Long | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Barry O'Kane | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Prof Peter Hollingsworth FRSE | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Kylie Nicole Jones | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Helena Jane Crouch | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Mary Dean | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Sandra Knapp | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £459.87k | £396.35k | £459.44k | £538.43k | £818.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £503.60k | £421.90k | £500.83k | £622.47k | £697.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £40.50k | £79.93k | £54.05k | £74.34k | £130.96k | |
|
Income from government grants | £60.92k | £58.01k | £82.68k | £72.78k | £70.91k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £73.18k | £187.44k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £207.60k | £322.43k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.59k | £22.50k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £237.06k | £285.87k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £291 | £9.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £527.06k | £559.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £95.41k | £137.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £98.89k | £97.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.53k | £11.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £694.84k | £729.19k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £365.55k | £577.18k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £225.97k | £297.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2015 as amended on 21 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF AND INTEREST IN THE BRITISH AND IRISH VASCULAR PLANT AND CHAROPHYTE FLORA. 2. TO SUPPORT, ENCOURAGE, CARRY OUT AND PARTICIPATE IN RESEARCH INTO THE TAXONOMY, ECOLOGY, BIOGEOGRAPHY AND CONSERVATION OF THE BRITISH AND IRISH FLORA AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH CONTINENTAL AND OTHER BOTANISTS IN MATTERS OF MUTUAL INTEREST AND CONCERN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BSBI c/o Moore Kingston Smith LLP
4 Beaconsfield Road
St Albans
Hertfordshire
AL1 3RD
- Phone:
- 01727 838255
- Email:
- info@wmtllp.com
- Website:
-
bsbi.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window