Financial history DENBIGH MUSEUM/AMGUEDDFA DINBYCH

Charity Number: 1152905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £34.15k £37.89k £12.25k £14.71k £20.33k
Total expenditure £9.36k £12.48k £13.44k £20.42k £14.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.79k £20.59k £584 N/A N/A