Trustees DENBIGH MUSEUM/AMGUEDDFA DINBYCH

Charity Number: 1152905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP WILLIAMS Trustee 15 May 2025
CONWY AND DENBIGHSHIRE MENTAL HEALTH ADVOCACY SERVICE LTD
Received: On time
Meira Jones Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Gethin Clwyd Jones Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
medwyn jones Trustee 26 June 2020
FREEMAN EVANS ST DAVID'S DAY DENBIGH CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ROBERT DAVID HUGHES SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION
Received: On time
David Wynn Davies Trustee 02 May 2018
NORTH WALES WILDLIFE TRUST
Received: On time
Anthony Gray Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
Carys Harries Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
DENBIGH TOWN COUNCIL Trustee 28 May 2014
DR EVAN PIERCE GARDENS TRUST
Received: On time
RICHARD SNELSON Trustee 16 May 2013
CYMDEITHAS CYMRU-ARIANNIN
Received: On time
Vesi Jones Trustee 28 November 2012
None on record
CLWYD WYNNE Trustee 28 November 2012
VALE OF CLWYD MIND ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Wendy Grey Lloyd Trustee 28 November 2012
None on record
MEDWYN FFRANCON WILLIAMS Trustee 14 August 2012
None on record