Financial history THE HENRY AND SUZANNE DAVIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/06/2020 27/06/2021 27/06/2022 27/06/2023 27/06/2024
Total gross income £112.50k £75.01k £200.00k £63.04k £435.19k
Total expenditure £106.12k £52.47k £97.17k £33.46k £114.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A