MATHSWORLDUK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MathsWorldUK is a company that has the intention of setting up a museum/discovery centre for mathematics in the UK. During the year 2019-20 MathsWorldUK raised funds to equip and put forth a touring mathematics exhibition. We are about to open a physical centre, known as MathsCity, in Leeds so that we can display to the public many mathematical exhibits, puzzles games, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 December 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Ian Callaghan | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Philipp Legner | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Griffiths | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christoph Karl Bergemann | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Rushworth | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lynne McClure | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Ruth Marie Holland | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clapham | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Boulton Ward | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR ROGER ANTHONY FISKEN MA DPHIL | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|||||
KIT YATES | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MARGARET LOUISE BROWN MA PHD | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.94k | £187.70k | £351.66k | £184.36k | £406.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.25k | £148.35k | £302.40k | £200.01k | £349.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATHEMATICS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MUSEUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STRINGER HOUSE
34 LUPTON STREET
LEEDS
LS10 2QW
- Phone:
- 01635578470
- Email:
- daardon@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window