ALTRINCHAM FOOTBALL CLUB COMMUNITY SPORTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity delivers coaching in Trafford Schools, Youth Clubs, holiday football ?Fun Weeks? - all for boys and girls. Also supports Ladies football via Training, Coaching, and matches. Charity also operates a Community Sports Hall which provides activities to all ages and fitness levels in the local community incl Yoga, Senior Aerobics, After school clubs, Walking Football, Duke of Edinb, Tumbletots
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £6,534 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Trafford
Governance
- 30 October 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shalni Arora | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Phil Ascott | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Benjamin Harry Greenwood | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel Bunce | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen John Busby | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Samantha Justine MacKenzie | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Grahame Philip Rowley | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
MR TONY COLLIER | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
KAREN ROWLEY | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.68k | £256.22k | £217.31k | £309.85k | £312.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £234.72k | £251.16k | £211.24k | £318.89k | £329.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.18k | £1.60k | N/A | £72.38k | £6.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 July 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 July 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Altrincham Association Football Club Ltd
Moss Lane
Hale
ALTRINCHAM
Cheshire
WA15 8AP
- Phone:
- 07557101803
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window