Financial history MYBIGCAREER

Charity Number: 1153880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £205.58k £10.50k £145.20k £169.17k £208.98k
Total expenditure £13.89k £141.63k £126.26k £169.06k £239.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A