Financial history DEBENHAM LIBRARY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154313
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £1.68k £300 £0 £2.97k £126
Total expenditure £1.65k £369 £740 £1.69k £527
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £300 N/A N/A N/A