DEBENHAM LIBRARY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Debenham Library Foundation is to ensure the provision of a public library service in Debenham and the surrounding area of Suffolk, through the provision of a suitable space. It also work to provide additional community services and events in the library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 October 2013: CIO registration
- DLF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Katherine Harling-Challis | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Howard Clive Simpson | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
MAUREEN JOHN | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM BLACKWELL | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||
ANTONY JOHN HUTT | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £300 | £0 | £2.97k | £126 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65k | £369 | £740 | £1.69k | £527 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £300 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCTION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN DEBENHAM, SUFFOLK, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A LENDING LIBRARY. (2) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF DEBENHAM, SUFFOLK, AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPTIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Debenham Library Foundation
School Corner
Debenham
STOWMARKET
Suffolk
IP14 6PL
- Phone:
- 01728861940
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window