ALFORD CORN EXCHANGE COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit the residents of Alford by bringing together the residents, voluntary and other organisations in an effort to provide social welfare and leisure to improve the life of the residents. To secure the building as a community centre at the historic Alford Corn Exchange and to maintain and manage the building for activities promoted by the charity in furtherance of the above objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 08 December 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Ivan O'Farrell | Chair | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Denver Robert Husband | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Vickers | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
June Elizabeth Husband | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Iaquaniello | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Neil Calvert | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Hynes | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANICE MCHAMILTON | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
HARRY DEWICK-EISELE | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PATRICK TAYLOR | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.49k | £117.30k | £63.66k | £55.54k | £76.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.05k | £144.95k | £50.42k | £56.19k | £80.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF ALFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AT THE HISTORIC ALFORD CORN EXCHANGE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE BUILDING FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alford Corn Exchange Comm. Group
The Corn Exchange
9 Market Place
ALFORD
Lincolnshire
LN13 9EB
- Phone:
- 01507462517
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window