Financial history The Three Towns

Charity number: 1153969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.59k £4.91k £21.10k £22.19k £32.66k
Total expenditure £4.15k £4.85k £23.38k £23.89k £28.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A