TRINITY (METHODIST/UNITED REFORMED) CHURCH, GOLDERS GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) celebration of public worship; (b) teaching the Christian faith; (c) mission and evangelism; (d) pastoral work including visiting the sick and the bereaved; (e) provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community including (but not restricted to) the elderly, the young and other groups with special needs; (f) support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
- Brent
- Camden
- Haringey
Governance
- 03 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edna Grace Kofi-Opata Kofi Apata | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Mary Brown | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Theodora Matey | Trustee | 22 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Martin Wellings | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Charlotte Chanda Silwizya BA MCSI | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
HELEN TANEDO | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
ELAINE BROWN | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
ERIC BROWN | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MONINA QUIN | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr BITRUS JUGUL DANBOYI DOCTOR | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
ENCARNACION MANALILI | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
IVAN BONNETT | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
GEORGINA SAKA-SIRIBOE BARRISTER | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MINNY GILLES | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.34k | £62.52k | £54.24k | £85.95k | £101.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.75k | £82.05k | £60.11k | £80.73k | £75.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 HODFORD ROAD
GOLDERS GREEN
LONDON
NW11 8EG
- Phone:
- 02084580892
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window