THE ALLEN OVERY SHEARMAN STERLING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation was established to provide donations for the benefit of any one or more qualified charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£2,039,971
Donations and legacies | £2.02m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £21.54k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,242,180
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.24m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.24m | |
Retained for future use | £797.79k |
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Ethiopia
- Guinea
- Kenya
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Mozambique
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- The Gambia
Governance
- 09 September 2013: Standard registration
- THE ALLEN & OVERY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilde van der Baan | Chair | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ruth Longley | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Chrisann Suzanne Jarrett MBE | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Franz Joseph Ranero | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elaine Johnston | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Margaret Page | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Hannigan | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Helen Clist | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK JEREMY MANSELL | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Philip Mansfield | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.84m | £1.62m | £1.53m | £2.31m | £2.04m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45m | £1.49m | £1.77m | £1.87m | £1.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.84m | £1.62m | £1.53m | £2.30m | £2.02m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.55k | £692 | £640 | £4.89k | £21.54k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.45m | £1.49m | £1.77m | £1.87m | £1.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.45m | £1.49m | £1.77m | £1.87m | £1.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £714.19k | £880.73k | £576.08k | £1.03m | £1.83m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £34.50k | £67.00k | £10.00k | £20.00k | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 JUL 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 APR 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUN 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2024
Charitable objects
4.1 THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND WORLDWIDE, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 4.1.1 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED WHETHER BECAUSE OF POVERTY, YOUTH, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; 4.1.2 THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AMONGST THOSE LEAST ABLE TO WITHSTAND THE EFFECTS OF A MAJOR NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER, WHICH SHALL INCLUDE SUFFERING CAUSED AS A RESULT OF CONFLICT; 4.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; 4.1.4 THE PROMOTION OF THE SOUND DEVELOPMENT AND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW; AND 4.1.5 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC AND WHICH ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS STATED ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEE DIRECTORS SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ONE
BISHOPS SQUARE
LONDON
E1 6AD
- Phone:
- 02030880000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window