EXETER LEUKAEMIA FUND CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ELF aims to lighten the load by supporting families affected by blood cancers and blood disorders across the South West. ELF provides transport, a counselling service, accommodation, complementary therapies, a CAB-funded advice and guidance service, legal services through partnership and refreshments for patients and relatives awaiting day case appointments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
94 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTOR ERIK STANHOPE SALOMONSEN | Chair | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Charlesworth | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Isabelle Marjorie Kenny | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Fox | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mary Hawkins | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shane Steven Cann | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Robert Cooper | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £761.45k | £496.77k | £377.76k | £460.52k | £451.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £750.07k | £671.71k | £351.91k | £459.09k | £518.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £150.94k | £19.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £432.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £280.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £46.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £116.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £378.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £371.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Nov 2013 as amended on 22 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM LEUKAEMIA AND RELATED DISEASES IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND (AND PARTICULARLY THOSE LIVING IN DEVON), AND THEIR RELATIVES AND LOVED ONES, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE, WHETHER TO THOSE PEOPLE OR TO HOSPITALS, CLINICS AND HOSPICES IN DEVON AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO LEUKAEMIA AND RELATED DISEASES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The ELF Office
Haematology Centre
Royal Devon & Exeter Hospital
Barrack Road
EXETER
EX2 5DW
- Phone:
- 01392493344
- Email:
- enquire@elfcharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window