RUGBY THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a repertory theatre in Rugby and the furtherance of education on the history, art and practice of drama.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 October 2013: Standard registration
- 07 June 2019: Funds received from 211108 THE RUGBY THEATRE SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Kay | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rumsey | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Kettle | Trustee | 03 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Joseph Peter Craddock | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FREDERICK RATCLIFFE | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Anthony Leonard | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PLAYER GRAIN | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Paul Tolchard | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Hibberd | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
EMMA LOUISE BRIGHT | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.00k | £51.29k | £20.64k | £193.32k | £314.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £287.75k | £99.31k | £78.71k | £178.44k | £268.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.21k | £14.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JAN 2013
Charitable objects
THE FOUNDATION AND MAINTENANCE OF A REPERTORY THEATRE IN RUGBY AND/OR SUCH OTHE PLACE OR PLACES IN ENGLAND AND WITH OR WITHOUT SUCH ANCILLARY SCHOOLS OF INSTRUCTION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE HISTORY, ART AND PRACTICE OF THE DRAMA BY MEANS OF PERFORMANCES OF PLAYS, LECTURES AND SUCH OTHER METHODS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUGBY THEATRE
CENTRAL HALL
HENRY STREET
RUGBY
CV21 2QA
- Phone:
- 01788541234
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window