RAINBOW MIGRATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is a world where there is equality, dignity, respect and safety for all people in the expression of their sexual orientation or gender identity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£833,348
Donations and legacies | £168.15k | |
Charitable activities | £658.44k | |
Other trading activities | £1.50k | |
Investments | £5.27k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£674,975
Raising funds | £72.64k | |
Charitable activities | £602.34k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £72.64k | |
Charitable expenditure | £602.34k | |
Retained for future use | £158.37k |
People

14 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 2014: CIO registration
- 11 July 2016: Funds received from 1101400 UK LESBIAN AND GAY IMMIGRATION GROUP
- UKLGIG (Working name)
- RAINBOW MIGRATION. (Previous name)
- UK LESBIAN AND GAY IMMIGRATION GROUP (Previous name)
- UK LESBIAN AND GAY IMMIGRATION GROUP. (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Scott Addison | Chair | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tanishtha Sen Gupta | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hadeel Omara | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Lyons | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ilaria Michelis | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hussein Hosham Said | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles George Bishop | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Jane Finch | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PATRICK WILLIAM Egan | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.14k | £489.04k | £466.62k | £489.29k | £833.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.07k | £298.85k | £396.24k | £562.44k | £674.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £168.15k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £658.44k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.27k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £602.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £72.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.45k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £510.61k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 07 NOV 2018 AMENDED ON 26 NOV 2019 AMENDED ON 31 OCT 2019 AMENDED ON 06 OCT 2020 AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2021 as amended on 09 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: - HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET OUT IN THE EUROPEAN CONVENTION ON HUMAN RIGHTS, THE 1951 CONVENTION RELATING TO THE STATUS OF REFUGEES AND ITS PROTOCOLS, THE EUROPEAN UNION TREATIES AND DIRECTIVES APPLICABLE TO THE UK AND AS APPLICABLE, THE CHARTER OF FUNDAMENTAL RIGHTS OF THE EUROPEAN UNION OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANS*, QUEER AND INTERSEX (LGBTQI+) PEOPLE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE RIGHT TO ASYLUM, TO FREEDOM OF MOVEMENT AND RESIDENCE AND THE RIGHT NOT TO BE SUBJECT TO TORTURE OR CRUEL, INHUMAN OR DEGRADING TREATMENT, AND RESPECT FOR FAMILY AND PRIVATE LIFE; AND - EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INTERNATIONALLY AS SET OUT IN THE EQUALITY ACT 2010 AND SIMILAR INSTRUMENTS AND THE EUROPEAN CONVENTION ON HUMAN RIGHTS, THE 1951 CONVENTION RELATING TO THE STATUS OF REFUGEES AND ITS PROTOCOLS, THE EUROPEAN UNION TREATIES AND DIRECTIVES APPLICABLE TO THE UK AND AS APPLICABLE, THE CHARTER OF FUNDAMENTAL RIGHTS OF THE EUROPEAN UNION AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL OR GENDER IDENTITY, IN PARTICULAR DIGNITY, RESPECT AND SAFETY FOR LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANS*, QUEER AND INTERSEX PLUS (LGBTQI+) WHO HAVE IMMIGRATION ISSUES RELATED TO THEIR SEXUAL OR GENDER IDENTITY BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN THE FIELD OF IMMIGRATION AND ASYLUM LAW TO PEOPLE WHO ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION AS A RESULT OF THEIR LACK OF RESOURCES; (2) THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST LGBTQI+ ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES BY THE PROVISION OF NON LEGAL SUPPORT; (3) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH IN IMMIGRATION LAW AND POLICY AND PUBLISHING THE SAME TO THE PUBLIC; (4) RAISING AWARENESS OF ANY ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY RELATING TO IMMIGRATION ISSUES FOR LGBTQI+ PEOPLE BY PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION; (5) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON HUMAN RIGHTS, EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY RELATING TO IMMIGRATION ISSUES FOR LGBTQI+ PEOPLE AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF THE SAME TO THE PUBLIC; (6) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN HUMAN RIGHTS, EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY RELATING TO IMMIGRATION ISSUES FOR LGBTQI+ PEOPLE WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS; (7) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF HUMAN RIGHTS, EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY RELATING TO IMMIGRATION ISSUES FOR LGBTQI+ PEOPLE BY THE USE OF PUBLICATIONS, CODES OF PRACTICE, THE MEDIA AND PUBLIC ADVOCACY; (8) ADVOCATING FOR THE RIGHTS OF LGBTQI+ PEOPLE OUTSIDE THE UK; (9) ADVANCING LAW AND POLICY RELATING TO HUMAN RIGHTS AND EQUALITY IN LGBTQI+ ASYLUM AND IMMIGRATION, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY INCLUDING COMMENTING ON PROPOSED LEGISLATION.”?
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rainbow Migration
17 Oval Way
London
SE11 5RR
- Phone:
- 0203 752 5801
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window