USWSU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Extra-curricular and development opportunities through sports teams, clubs and societies. Community volunteering and fundraising.Democratic engagement of students through its' governance structures creating employability skills. The development of cultural and civic values such as tolerance and social cohesion, in order to have a wider and positive influence on social and political development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£2,312,937
Donations and legacies | £1.45m | |
Charitable activities | £774.41k | |
Other trading activities | £83.01k | |
Investments | £2.34k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,236,817
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.24m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.24m | |
Retained for future use | £76.12k |
People

136 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
600 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
- Newport City
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 29 August 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emilie Tapping | Chair | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jahid Hasan | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DMSA NAVID | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imam Hossain | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Daisy Powell | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Main MBE | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.52m | £1.83m | £2.50m | £2.19m | £2.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.42m | £1.31m | £2.26m | £2.13m | £2.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £113.66k | £269.51k | £28.76k | £59.19k | £12.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.35m | £1.60m | £1.46m | £1.33m | £1.45m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £261.91k | £103.42k | £261.78k | £77.76k | £83.01k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £908.43k | £120.43k | £776.50k | £784.48k | £774.41k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £224 | £17 | £134 | £1.86k | £2.34k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £571 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £1.60m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.23m | £1.24m | £2.04m | £1.66m | £2.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £219.74k | £468.31k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £90.95k | £65.43k | £65.28k | £52.26k | £83.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £95.40k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £190.61k | £69.07k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £49.62k | £42.76k | £50.96k | £78.70k | £57.14k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £274.32k | £442.91k | £609.77k | £311.98k | £242.43k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.84m | -£2.77m | -£2.74m | -£2.74m | -£2.58m | |
|
Total liabilities | £437.38k | £233.60k | £351.96k | £223.11k | £265.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JUL 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE UNION ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 4.1 PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH WALES DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; 4.2 BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH WALES AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND 4.3 PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH WALES
STUDENTS UNION
FOREST GROVE
TREFOREST
PONTYPRIDD
CF37 1UF
- Phone:
- 01443483500
- Email:
- studunion@southwales.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window