INDUS HEALTH NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING AND APPEALS TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC FOR FUNDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Pakistan
Governance
- 29 November 2013: Standard registration
- 14 October 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1194571 INDUS HEALTH NETWORK UK
- THE INDUS HOSPITAL CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £823.83k | £1.47m | £1.24m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £630.96k | £1.06m | £1.30m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £823.83k | £1.47m | £1.24m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £552.85k | £952.44k | £1.14m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £78.11k | £103.49k | £155.98k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £24.57k | £25.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £860.21k | £1.05m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN KARACHI AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER, BY PROVIDING AID, ASSISTING IN SETTING UP HOSPITALS, CLINICS AND VACCINATION CENTRES AND MEDICAL CENTRES AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS DEEMED SUITABLE, FOR SUCH PERSONS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
KARCHI AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window