OXSHOTT VILLAGE SPORTS CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Purposes of the Club are to provide facilities for a number of amateur sports (?the Sports?) in Oxshott and to promote the same and encourage community participation in the Sports and the social activity of Bridge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 January 2014: Standard registration
- OVSC (Working name)
- OXSHOTT VILLAGE SPORTS CLUB LTD. (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT BUTLER | Chair | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Watkins | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Malcolm | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Clarke | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ross Campbell Hunt | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Gabriel | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Young | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.50k | £249.37k | £352.19k | £380.80k | £400.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £361.36k | £165.97k | £280.42k | £330.04k | £295.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £23.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 January 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 January 2021 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES THAT ARE LOCATED IN OXSHOTT WHICH ARE USED FOR THE PROMOTION AND PLAYING OF SPORT IN THE LOCAL AND WIDER COMMUNITY,AND FOR THE HEALTHY RECREATION OF INDIVIDUALS REGARDLESS OF THEIR SOCIAL OR OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES,WHERE THE OBJECT IS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oxshott Village Sports Club
Steels Lane
Oxshott
LEATHERHEAD
Surrey
KT22 0RF
- Phone:
- 01372843652
- Email:
- office@oxshottsports.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window