REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - FRAGRANCE OF LIFE CONNECTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUSTS ARE: 2.2.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. 2.2.2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IT PURSUES THESE OBJECTS BY A PROGRAMME OF EVENTS AIMED AT REACHING OUT TO THE UN-CHURCHED TOGETHER WITH A RANGE OF COMMUNITY-CENTRED PROJECTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 November 2013: Standard registration
- FRAGRANCE OF LIFE CONNECTIONS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADETOYESE ADEDEJI | Chair | 23 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Monisola Osibogun | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR OMOTUNDE OLUREMI WILLIAMS | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.57k | £21.86k | £22.66k | £18.78k | £49.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.77k | £14.36k | £22.72k | £22.64k | £48.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 AUG 2013
Charitable objects
2.2. THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUSTS ARE: 2.2.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. 2.2.2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FORMERBUILDING
THE SALVATION ARMY
JARROM STREET
LEICESTER
LE2 7DX
- Phone:
- 07501808287
- Email:
- admin@rccgfolc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window