OUT OF THE BLUE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes centred on support of other military charities and personnel whether on active service or otherwise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 July 2014: CIO registration
- 08 December 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 08 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1081009 THE ROYAL AIR FORCE BENEVOLENT FUND
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2017 | 01/09/2018 | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.79k | £13.73k | £4.80k | £2.66k | £2.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.64k | £16.52k | £3.69k | £4.02k | £2.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 126 days late | |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | 28 days late | |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 17 September 2020 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | 17 September 2020 | 78 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT SUCH REGISTERED CHARITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE SUPPORTING MILITARY PERSONNEL AND THEIR FAMILIES, AND/OR INDIVIDUALS IN NEED OF SUPPORT (WHETHER SERVING OR FORMER MILITARY PERSONNEL OR THEIR FAMILIES OR DEPENDANTS) IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window