COMMUNITY FURNITURE STORE (RYEDALE) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Charity has three main aims. We primarily assist people in need, chiefly through the provision of donated household goods and new furniture and white goods at affordable prices. We also offer training and work experience placements and employment. We protect the environment by collecting items that would otherwise go to waste.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 27 March 2014: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY FURNITURE STORE RYEDALE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David James Nash | Chair | 14 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Miles Edward David Goring | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|||||||
Thomas Meares | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Emma Laura Thorne | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Vera Van Gool | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Prakash Mistry | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Matthew Farrelly | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
Tom Jenkins | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Graham Mitchell | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.04k | £188.82k | £190.45k | £183.86k | £227.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.48k | £150.97k | £176.42k | £199.19k | £226.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/02/2013 as amended on 22 Nov 2022 as amended on 15 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
a. To relieve generally or individually persons who are in conditions of need, hardship, or distress for reasons including, but not limited to, lack of resources, sudden emergency, ill-health, disability, or other disadvantage. b. To provide by gift, sale, or otherwise, furniture, household goods and other items or services to relieve need, hardship or distress and prevent exclusion from essential services. c. To raise public awareness of, and encourage recycling, reuse, or repurposing of furniture and other household items, including by collecting unwanted items and making them available for others to use. d. To promote and provide life and work skills support and work experience for people who are unemployed or would otherwise benefit from such services. e. To promote any other charitable activity that is consistent with these objects, which shall be selected by the trustees at their absolute discretion.?
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 29 Raylor Centre
James Street
YORK
YO10 3DW
- Phone:
- 01723267177
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
communityfurniturestore.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window