Trustees CONINGSBY COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 504135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHERYL SIMMONS Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
SALLY WILLIAMSON Trustee 21 February 2025
None on record
LOUISE BARNES Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
MARILYN HAWKINS Trustee 20 February 2024
None on record
SHARON MARIE BEAMISH Trustee 13 February 2024
THE RICHARD AND ANGELA MAXWELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
RUSSELL IVOR GREEN Trustee 21 February 2023
CONINGSBY AND TATTERSHALL AGE CONCERN LUNCHEON CLUB
Received: On time
Ann Wilkes Trustee 10 January 2022
TATTERSHALL VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
WALTER FREDERICK LIMB Trustee 18 August 2020
None on record
Penelope Ann Bowen Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record
Nigel Glyn Olive Trustee 15 January 2019
STANLEY BARKER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOSEPH BANKES
Received: On time
ROBERT LAWRENCE
Received: On time
CHARITY OF GEORGE METHAM (WISBECH)
Received: On time
John Robert Hanson Trustee 21 January 2016
None on record
Ruth Mary Sharples Trustee 20 January 2012
GRAVEL ALLOTMENTS
Received: On time
HELPING HANDS CONINGSBY
Received: On time
Richard Ellis Johnson Trustee 15 January 2012
ROBERT LAWRENCE
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOSEPH BANKES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF GEORGE METHAM (WISBECH)
Received: On time
MAURICE HAWKINS Trustee
None on record
BRENDA MARY BALCOMB Trustee
None on record