Financial history Ozero Arts

Charity number: 1155338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £81.66k £22.50k £50.25k £54.93k £274.77k
Total expenditure £76.54k £7.93k £69.95k £53.07k £278.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A