Financial history FAIJURRAHMAN-MUHIUSSUNNAH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1157403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £26.12k £25.16k £20.90k £28.90k £17.15k
Total expenditure £20.50k £24.73k £22.42k £25.04k £10.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A