WOKING BESOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encouraging the donation of household furniture and furnishings and distributing them free of charge to persons referred by Social Services and Housing departments of local authorities in the Woking area as persons in need of them. Also co-ordinating resources for local churches to undertake free of charge short term decorating and gardening projects at the homes of the persons referred to above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY AITKEN HEWAT | Chair | 17 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Julian Monk | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lesley Sutherland | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Frank | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN DEW | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.76k | £13.84k | £22.18k | £19.97k | £22.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.66k | £24.30k | £18.09k | £18.43k | £24.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO PERSONS IN WOKING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE DISTRIBUTION OF GIFTS OF HOUSEHOLD ITEMS, AND THE CARRYING OUT OF DECORATING, GARDENING AND SMALL DIY PROJECTS TO MEET THEIR NEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 13 Pankhurst Farm
Bagshot Road
West End
CHOBHAM
WOKING
Surrey
- Phone:
- 01276855215
- Email:
- wokingbesom@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window