THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, LITTLE MISSENDEN,

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 19 November 2013: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN THE BAPTIST LITTLE MISSENDEN (Working name)
- ST JOHN THE BAPTIST LITTLE MISSENDEN (Previous name)
- ST JOHN THE BAPTIST PCC, LITTLE MISSENDEN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE REVD JOHN VERRENT SIMPSON | Chair | 22 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Rhys Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr CATHERINE DEIDRE ELPHINSTONE | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MAY TOLMIE-THOMSON | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Valerie Haynes | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GARY BEYNON | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Marian Elaine Dickinson | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|||||
JOHN MATTHEW LAMB | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.45k | £112.87k | £107.56k | £93.87k | £209.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.88k | £95.62k | £103.38k | £97.51k | £103.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hill House
Frith Hill
GREAT MISSENDEN
Buckinghamshire
HP16 9QE
- Phone:
- 01494868645
- Email:
- office@lmchurch.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window