Financial history B3 - BE HEARD BE MOTIVATED BE FREE

Charity number: 1154933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £119.14k £164.19k £143.84k £141.36k £186.20k
Total expenditure £157.09k £113.29k £120.16k £143.15k £192.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £119.14k £164.09k £143.84k £141.24k £184.82k