THE BAPTIST UNION OF WALES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Baptist Union of Wales seeks to further the Gospel of Christ in accordance with the principles of the Baptists, working with member churches in Wales and associated with Wales, and facilitating co-operation between the Union, member churches, and other Christian Groups. It operates by providing support to member churches as they seek to work in their own communities and in their own language.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 03 December 2013: Standard registration
- 09 April 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 09 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1201058 THE BAPTIST UNION OF WALES
- BUW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £544.91k | £435.69k | £619.03k | £462.82k | £308.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £661.47k | £503.40k | £489.30k | £488.44k | £3.99m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £296.32k | N/A | £305.98k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £15.20k | N/A | £9.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £133.21k | N/A | £99.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £100.18k | N/A | £203.37k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £501.70k | N/A | £489.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £159.78k | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 113 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE UNION IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION,ESPECIALLY BY THE MEANS OF AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION IN PARTICULAR,BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,THROUGH ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS:- 1. TO PROPAGATE THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE DOCTRINE AND PRACTICE OF THE NEW TESTAMENT. 2. TO SUPPORT CHURCHES IN MAINTAINING MINISTRIES AND ASSISTING THE FORMATION OF CHURCHES AND SUNDAY SCHOOLS,DISTRIBUTING THE SCRIPTURES AND ISSUING RELIGIOUS PUBLICATIONS AND BY SUCH OTHER METHODS AS THE COUNCILS OR JOINT COUNCIL SHALL DETERMINE. 3. TO CULTIVATE AMONG ITS MEMBERS RESPECT,LOVE AND CO-OPERATION FOR AND WITH ONE ANOTHER WHILST RESPECTING THE INDEPENDENCE OF EVERY CHURCH IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ITS OWN GOVERNMENT AND DISCIPLINE. 4. TO CONFER AND SEEK CO-OPERATION WITH THE BAPTISTS IN WALES AND EVERY OTHER COUNTRY AND WITH CHURCHES AND OTHER CHRISTIAN BODIES IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE KINGDOM OF CHRIST. 5. TO SAFEGUARD THE PROPERTIES AND INTERESTS OF THE UNION AND THE CHURCHES,AND TO CONSIDER THE MOST APPROPRIATE MEANS TO NURTURE THESE RESOURCES FOR THE GOOD OF THE UNION,THE CHURCHES AND THE KINGDOM OF CHRIST. 6. TO USE ANY OTHER MEANS CONSONANT WITH THE MAIN OBJECT OF THE UNION,AS DECIDED BY THE ASSEMBLIES OR THE JOINT COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME,IN ORDER TO FURTHER THE WORK OF THE DENOMINATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window