THE SOUNDROOM COMMUNITY MUSIC PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Soundroom is a community music charity which offers music and arts activities for a range of participants, including adults with learning disabilities, children, young and older people. The Soundroom also provides affordable rehearsal and recording facilities. The charity works for the public benefit and aims to advance education in music and the arts in Gateshead and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,855 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
Governance
- 17 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Ferrell | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA DONKIN | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
LISA LEONARD | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN HANCOCK | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.75k | £50.91k | £39.04k | £50.87k | £57.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.91k | £57.91k | £53.39k | £55.11k | £51.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £32.71k | £7.40k | N/A | £8.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN MUSIC AND THE ARTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A VENUE IN GATESHEAD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
REDHEUGH STUDIOS
CUTHBERT STREET
GATESHEAD
TYNE AND WEAR
NE8 1PH
- Phone:
- 01914771116
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window