THE APPLES & PEARS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Apples & Pears Foundation is a charity enabling inner city families to access new opportunities and experiences through weekend school trips with their children and volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 August 2014: Standard registration
- 15 December 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 15 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1010192 HALF MOON YOUNG PEOPLE'S THEATRE LIMITED
- THE YOUTHLINK NETWORK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.77k | £24.70k | £21.34k | £60.11k | £12.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.55k | £14.86k | £19.37k | £45.25k | £27.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 23 December 2019 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 23 December 2019 | 206 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/08/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE AND RELIEF OF NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING FUNDING AND GRANTS FOR: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND TO APPRECIATE THE IMPORTANCE OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
TOWER HAMLETS SOUTHWARK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window