Trustees THE STONDON SINGERS
Charity Number: 1154435

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Kenneth Alston | Chair | 29 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Mark Frederick Ellis | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Emma Adams | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Mary Arthur | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Susan Malton | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Punnett | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Merle Dimon | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phil Holmes | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.