HUDDERSFIELD MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing services for people in need, such as food, shelter, advice, support and developmental activities. Offering a town centre community facility, with space for meetings, classes and rooms for rent. Facilitating dialogue between different groups in Kirklees and enabling vulnerable and marginalised people to be heard. Hosting faith-based groups for worship and sharing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £100,709 from 5 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kirklees
Governance
- 08 April 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Catford | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Mason | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Amanda Jayne Ogilive-Berry | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Till | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Evans | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve William Caddy | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ros Page | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Thompson | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA LEE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £419.96k | £446.83k | £539.25k | £536.45k | £496.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £489.43k | £482.74k | £401.59k | £587.60k | £497.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.18k | £87.68k | £196.69k | £85.52k | £100.71k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £412.60k | £375.22k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £69.61k | £47.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £57.03k | £113.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £15 | £152 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £401.59k | £587.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.03k | £1.63k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
(A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; AND (E) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Huddersfield Mission
3-13 Lord Street
Huddersfield
HD1 1QA
- Phone:
- 01484421461
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window