Trustees KESWICK MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY MANAGEMENT LIMITED
Charity number: 1156330

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Mackay | Chair | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mitchell | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy-Jane Charlotte Johnston | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Chatton | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aemilia Ruth Gaussen McCooey | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Jeanette Edgar BA | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.