THE VINEYARD CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Key activities : Sunday meetings averaging 60 with children, midweek Life Groups in Richmond, Hampton and North Kingston and supporting Richmond Street Pastors, Richmond Food Bank, the Vineyard Community Centre, Community Chaplains, Kick London, the Glass Door Winter Night Shelter Scheme and Hope for Justice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 04 December 2013: Standard registration
- 08 January 2015: Funds received from 1138709 RICHMOND BOROUGH CHURCH
- THE VINEYARD LIFE CHURCH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA FLOWER | Chair | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Madryll Stileman BA | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Flower BA AKC | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|||||
ENID JOY KIMMERLING | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £461.08k | £224.03k | £219.25k | £368.58k | £351.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £256.33k | £165.35k | £166.33k | £203.27k | £268.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JUL 2013
Charitable objects
1) THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND USAGES FOR THE TIME BEING OF CONGREGATIONALISM AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY SPECIFIC REQUIREMENTS IN THE FOUNDATION TRUSTS. 2) THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION RELIEVE NEED AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vineyard Life Church
The Vineyard
RICHMOND
TW10 6AQ
- Phone:
- 07460 207361
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window