Trustees RAPE CRISIS ENGLAND & WALES
Charity Number: 1155140

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maggie Parks OBE | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Taryn Lister | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Beaumont-Orr | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Veitch OBE | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jackie May | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Grace McGregor | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shondelle James | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Adams | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meera Kulkarni | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Thompson | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Harkin | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.