VISIBLE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The majority of Visible's activities are delivered through our flagship initiative-the Naked Truth Project. A project that seeks to open eyes and free lives from the damaging impact of pornography. We provide awareness, education and recovery programmes to men, women & young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 April 2014: CIO registration
- 29 October 2021: Funds received from 1179791 CWTCH EDUCATION CIO
- VISIBLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JON HANCOCK | Chair | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Laura Healey | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel John Ward | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Adrian Philip Latty | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Leslie | Trustee | 27 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219.09k | £294.66k | £328.61k | £372.67k | £446.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.73k | £237.68k | £323.83k | £388.87k | £413.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE. 2. ADVANCE OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AREA OF CHRISTIANITY AND THE AREA OF SEXUAL HEALTH. 3. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Visible/Naked Truth Project
BeeHive Lofts at Waulk Mill
Unit 3.1, 51 Bengal St
MANCHESTER
M4 6LN
- Phone:
- 01616370240
- Email:
- hello@visibleministries.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window