THE HC-ONE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our aim is to relieve the effects of financial hardship, sickness and poor health amongst elderly people by supporting practical solutions that lead to their increased personal independence, self-sufficiency and dignity.Giving grants to the elderly to obtain specialist equipment, adapt accommodation, or to gain access to goods or services to help them overcome the debilities of old age.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £17,000
Total expenditure: £50,494

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR CHAI PATEL Chair 17 February 2014
None on record
James Tugendhat Trustee 19 July 2021
NOAH'S ARK - THE CHILDREN'S HOSPICE
Received: On time
THE GALEN AND HILARY WESTON FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sir David Behan Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Professor MARTIN LEWIS GREEN OBE Trustee 17 February 2014
None on record
Dr RICHARD LIVINGSTON HAWKINS Trustee 17 February 2014
None on record
DAVID ANDREW SPRUZEN Trustee 17 February 2014
THE MCGILVRAY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £100.89k £60 £97 £0 £17.00k
Total expenditure £462 £60.46k £50.46k £50.46k £50.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 November 2022 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Southgate House
Archer Street
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL3 6AH
Phone:
01325 351 100
Website:

hc-onefoundation.com