THE ALDEBURGH JUBILEE HALL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aldeburgh Jubilee Hall exists as a centre of entertainment for the people of Aldeburgh and its visitors. It hosts theatrical productions, opera, concerts and music of many genres, festivals, conferences, meetings, and community activities,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 February 2014: CIO registration
- 20 April 2015: Funds received from 209482 THE ALDEBURGH JUBILEE HALL
- THE ALDEBURGHJUBILEE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Charlotte Barkway | Chair | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Saltaire | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Hope | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Dow | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Emma Lloyd FCIM | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL IAN HOWCUTT | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN CHAPLIN | Trustee | 09 August 2016 |
|
|||||
His Honour David Lindsay Mackie CBE KC | Trustee | 09 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.50k | £100.72k | £62.30k | £433.15k | £146.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.01k | £47.70k | £101.02k | £123.79k | £179.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £89.66k | £13.72k | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF AND VISITORS TO THE BOROUGH OF ALDEBURGH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND VISITORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aldeburgh Jubilee Hall
Crabbe Street
ALDEBURGH
IP15 5BN
- Phone:
- 07377 092828
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window