WENTWORTH WOODHOUSE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1155374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE WENTWORTH WOODHOUSE PRESERVATION TRUST IS A CHARITABLE COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE AND HAS BEEN ESTABLISHED TO SECURE A LONG TERM FUTURE FOR WENTWORTH WOODHOUSE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Rotherham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 May 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALEXANDER WILLIAM JAMES DAVIES-TERRY Trustee 06 December 2024
WENTWORTH CHARITY
Received: On time
Darren Baker Trustee 30 July 2024
None on record
Richard Jeffrey Outhwaite Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Bronwen Jeanette Knight Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Matthew James Warren Hirst Trustee 20 April 2021
THE LECHE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LECHE TRUST
Recently registered
ANDREW DAVID WILLIAM SHEPHERD Trustee 13 October 2020
THE INSTITUTE OF HISTORIC BUILDING CONSERVATION
Received: On time
EMMAUS SHEFFIELD
Received: On time
John Christopher Caldwell Trustee 20 November 2018
ROUNDABOUT LIMITED
Received: On time
Timothy John Cooke OBE Trustee 01 June 2017
THE D G LYNALL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WATERLOO 200 LTD
Received: On time
THE ATTINGHAM TRUST FOR THE STUDY OF COUNTRY HOUSES AND COLLECTIONS IN BRITAIN
Received: On time
THE ATTINGHAM TRUST FOR THE STUDY OF HISTORIC HOUSES AND COLLECTIONS IN BRITAIN
Recently registered
MARTIN DRURY Trustee 01 June 2017
THE PENNINGTON MELLOR MUNTHE CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE FARINGDON COLLECTION TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF DILETTANTI CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
PROJECT HOUGOUMONT LIMITED
Received: On time
Dame Julie Ann Kenny DBE DL Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.98m £3.93m £4.42m £6.04m £7.24m
Total expenditure £4.42m £4.98m £4.70m £6.01m £7.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.07m £2.43m £1.17m £1.11m £1.90m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.61m £3.25m £3.12m £4.04m £5.10m
Income - Other trading activities £596.80k £242.82k £950.90k £1.66m £1.74m
Income - Charitable activities £262.04k £173.79k £323.60k £334.35k £394.35k
Income - Endowments £495.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.62k £3.32k £107 £2.48k £7.55k
Income - Other £0 £251.96k £24.84k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.98m £4.80m £3.92m £4.83m £5.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £438.72k £186.52k £781.69k £1.18m £1.46m
Expenditure - Governance £15.37k £11.16k £35.45k £33.43k £21.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £31 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £7.85m £7.97m £7.97m £8.01m £8.00m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £3.50m £2.37m £2.14m £2.24m £2.44m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £837.83k £885.87k £945.79k £1.06m £1.26m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ACQUIRE, HOLD IN TRUST AND RETAIN IN PERPETUITY FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE BUILDINGS, GROUNDS AND SURROUNDING LAND KNOWN AS WENTWORTH WOODHOUSE IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROTHERHAM AND WHICH ARE OF SPECIAL HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE AND INTEREST (THE "BUILDING") TOGETHER WITH SUCH FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, PICTURES AND CHATTELS AS ARE CONTAINED WITHIN OR FORM PART OF THE BUILDING AND WHICH ARE IN THEIR OWN RIGHT OR BY ASSOCIATION WITH THE BUILDING OBJECTS OF PARTICULAR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR ARTISTIC INTEREST (THE "OBJECT").
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 09 May 2017 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Wentworth Woodhouse
Wentworth
Rotherham
South Yorkshire
S62 7TQ
Phone:
01226351161
Website:

wentworthwoodhouse.org.uk