Financial history MEDICAL SCHOOLS COUNCIL

Charity Number: 1155370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.24m £1.30m £1.51m £2.17m £2.62m
Total expenditure £1.43m £1.37m £1.37m £2.06m £2.44m
Income from government contracts £435.45k £502.62k £593.43k £432.81k £561.29k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.23m £1.30m £1.50m £2.11m £2.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.88k £309 £5.71k £65.41k £103.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.43m £1.37m £1.37m £2.06m £2.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.13k £13.60k £15.39k £18.70k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0