Academy of the Annunciation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distance learning Theological College, providing courses in Catholic Theology
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 February 2014: Standard registration
- 16 June 2016: Funds received from 1064460 CATHOLIC NATIONAL LIBRARY
- SCHOOL OF THE ANNUNCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Edwina Cowan | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Graham Edwards | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brother - Religious Franciso Johannes Antonio Hintikka | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Charles Hollamby-Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326.64k | £39.19k | £67.81k | £52.66k | £40.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £330.64k | £47.73k | £46.26k | £65.60k | £38.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/12/2013 as amended on 04 Dec 2019 as amended on 25 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH THE EDUCATION OF CLERGY AND LAY PEOPLE IN CHRISTIAN LIFE INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) PROVISION OF COURSES IN THEOLOGY PHILOSOPHY EVANGELISATION AND CHRISTIAN CULTURE.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oratory House
Sacred Heart Church
1 Albert Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH1 1BZ
- Phone:
- 07742 150006
- Email:
- enquiries@aoa-edu.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window