WASHINGTON COMMUNITY FOOD PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a food bank.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,892 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sunderland
Governance
- 27 March 2014: Standard registration
- WCFP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Audrey Allen | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Dalgleish | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Murray | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Welch | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Margaret Jordan | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Watson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicola Jobson | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Spellman | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Petherick | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Michelle Natton | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.49k | £111.59k | £76.05k | £130.04k | £132.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.67k | £56.31k | £60.86k | £120.54k | £139.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.04k | £2.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2014 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2016 AS AMENDED ON 17 JAN 2017 as amended on 15 Jan 2018 as amended on 14 Jan 2019 as amended on 05 Nov 2018 as amended on 04 May 2020 as amended on 04 May 2020 as amended on 05 Feb 2021 as amended on 05 Feb 2021 as amended on 05 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN WASHINGTON AND SPRINGWELL VILLAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY FOOD PARCELS, ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO INDIVIDUALS IN FINANCIAL NEED. CONTRIBUTING TO AND CO-OPERATING WITH CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY FROM WITHIN WASHINGTON AND SPRINGWELL VILLAGE.
Area of benefit
WASHINGTON AND SPRINGWELL VILLAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit O
Washington Galleries
Washington
Tyne and Wear
NE38 7SD
- Phone:
- 07450766226
- Email:
- washingtoncfp@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window