Financial history FIRST GIVE

Charity Number: 1156416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £545.15k £596.37k £707.63k £795.83k £886.11k
Total expenditure £451.42k £566.04k £807.58k £833.92k £812.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £545.09k £547.74k £632.70k £697.65k £722.81k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £37.55k £74.80k £92.15k £145.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £56 £15 £122 £6.03k £17.75k
Income - Other £0 £11.07k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £450.14k £566.04k £807.58k £833.92k £809.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.13k £1.20k £0 £1.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £87.00k £184.00k £196.00k £190.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.27k £0 £0 £0 £3.05k