PLAXTON FAMILY HOUSING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objective is to relieve elderly people living within the Borough of Scarborough who are in need, in particular but not exclusively by reason of financial hardship or disability, by providing housing for rent and items, services or facilities calculated to reduce the needs of such persons. We own 40 flats which are let at less than market rents to elderly people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 February 2014: CIO registration
- 07 October 2017: Funds received from 1117498 PLAXTON FAMILY HOUSING TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Mark Norrison Asquith | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Melvin Leslie TROTTER | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Jacqueline Alexandra Smith | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||
JANET HELEN JEFFERSON | Trustee | 08 September 2006 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.18k | £163.68k | £165.48k | £164.20k | £185.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.56k | £68.18k | £61.96k | £108.02k | £131.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 10 FEB 2014 AMENDED ON 18 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BURDEN ON ELDERLY PEOPLE BORN OR RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF SCARBOROUGH (NORTH YORKSHIRE) WHO ARE IN NEED, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DUE TO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR DISABILITY, BY PROVIDING AFFORDABLE RENTAL HOUSING AND ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF SCARBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hon Secretary
Plaxton Family Housing Trust
c/o 29 Mill Way
Scalby
Scarborough
YO13 0BG
- Phone:
- 07535318046
- Email:
- jackie.smith@pfhtrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window