DAVID FORBES-NIXON FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To create an employability skills project which will significantly improve the employment prospects of young people with special education needs; 2. To create a world class special needs school at Undershaw / Stepping Stones; and. 3. To fund research to find a cure for myeloma.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 February 2014: Standard registration
- DAVID FORBES-NIXON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- DFN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID FORBES-NIXON | Chair | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Brentnall | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Tom O'Beirne | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Forbes-Nixon | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eric William Low | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON NICHOLAS KONSTA | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Dickson | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £853.52k | £454.91k | £407.19k | £419.16k | £320.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67m | £1.54m | £1.17m | £653.75k | £566.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £92.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £250.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £142.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £444.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £15.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.63m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £46.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £96.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £470.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £46.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/02/2014 as amended on 18 Feb 2022 as amended on 20 Dec 2023 as amended on 29 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ALL PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-10 GROSVENOR GARDENS
LONDON
SW1W 0DH
- Phone:
- 02034323402
- Email:
- info@dfnfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window